U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00245-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Brenner
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 13, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 09, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • October 13, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 07, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • July 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • July 06, 2022: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.