U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00077-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reyes-Ayala
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
July, 2022
  • July 08, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 08, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Required]
  • July 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 08, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.