U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00211-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Jones
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order for Exam]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Order Withdrawing Warrant]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
July, 2022
  • July 07, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 07, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 07, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • July 07, 2022: [Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.