U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00073-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ninh
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 17, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 13, 2023: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 06, 2022: [Speedy Trial]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • July 18, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.