U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00079-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Martinez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • October 24, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • October 19, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 23, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 13, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • July 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 12, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • July 11, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 11, 2022: [Detention]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.