U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00075-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kenneth Noel Webb
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 06, 2023: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • January 06, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 05, 2023: [Suppress]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 22, 2022: [Trial Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 22, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 06, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order to Unseal Indictment]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • July 08, 2022: [Unseal Document]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 08, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.