U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00074-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Grover B. Jackson, III
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Judgment]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • September 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order to Unseal Indictment]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • July 08, 2022: [Unseal Document]
  • July 08, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 08, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • July 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.