U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00054-3
  • Case Name: USA v. Kibodeaux
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Travel]
  • January 06, 2023: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • January 05, 2023: [Modify Conditions of Release]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 22, 2022: [Exclude]
  • December 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • December 12, 2022: [Memorandum Decision]
  • December 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • October 20, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • October 07, 2022: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Indictment/Information]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 04, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 03, 2022: [Dismiss Indictment/Information]
August, 2022
  • August 22, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • August 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 21, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Travel]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • August 04, 2022: [Travel]
  • August 02, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • August 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • August 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • August 01, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 20, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • July 12, 2022: [Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.