U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00257-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ruffino
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Review of Detention]
November, 2022
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • November 08, 2022: [Forfeiture of Property]
  • November 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 15, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • August 02, 2022: [Discovery]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Fast Track Deadlines]
  • August 02, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Detention]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 18, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.