U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00224-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Pham, et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Continue]
April, 2025
  • April 04, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • April 04, 2025: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • March 28, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • March 28, 2025: [Appoint Counsel]
  • March 26, 2025: [Withdraw as Counsel]
  • March 26, 2025: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • March 25, 2025: [Review of Detention]
  • March 20, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 13, 2025: [Continue]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • January 17, 2023: [Withdraw as Counsel]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 07, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 06, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 06, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 16, 2022: [Continue]
  • August 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • August 01, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 28, 2022: [Discovery]
  • July 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 28, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct]
  • July 19, 2022: [Amend/Correct]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • July 13, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • July 13, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.