U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00253-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez-Rodriguez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 15, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 19, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 14, 2022: [Discovery]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.