U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00238-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gates
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • November 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • October 11, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 18, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 02, 2022: [Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Review of Detention]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 21, 2022: [Discovery]
  • July 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • July 21, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 14, 2022: [Detention]
  • July 14, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 14, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.