U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00023-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Walsh
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 16, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 07, 2022: [Departure from Sentencing]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • July 22, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • July 22, 2022: [Discovery]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • July 21, 2022: [Detention]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 20, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • July 15, 2022: [Hearing]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.