U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00248-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Romero
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 03, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 06, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 15, 2022: [Discovery]
  • July 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • July 15, 2022: [Brady Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.