U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00182-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Van Duren
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Opt Out of In-Person Hearing]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Opt Out of In-Person Hearing]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 31, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 23, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 27, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 18, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • July 18, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • July 18, 2022: [Discovery]
  • July 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • July 18, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.