U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00234-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Petersen
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 11, 2025: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • April 11, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 10, 2025: [Strike]
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 21, 2022: [Exclude]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 19, 2022: [Exclude]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • August 03, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • August 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 02, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 20, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 19, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • July 18, 2022: [Detention]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.