U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00246-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Mirenda
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • October 11, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Reassign Case]
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 30, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • August 30, 2022: [Discovery]
  • August 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 19, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.