U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00264-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shockley
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 17, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 07, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • September 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
July, 2022
  • July 20, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 20, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • July 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 20, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [Discovery]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.