U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00258-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Barela
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 03, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Continue]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [Protective Order]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • August 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 26, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 22, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • July 21, 2022: [Discovery]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • July 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 21, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • July 20, 2022: [Detention]
  • July 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • July 20, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.