U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00244-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Cram
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 01, 2025: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
March, 2025
  • March 28, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • March 28, 2025: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
September, 2022
  • September 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 08, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 08, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 01, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 17, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
  • August 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • August 09, 2022: [Review of Detention]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • July 28, 2022: [Discovery]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 28, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • July 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • July 26, 2022: [Detention]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.