U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00081-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Robledo et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 16, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 16, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • July 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 29, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • July 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ]
  • July 26, 2022: [Admission Pro Hac Vice (fee collected during entry)]
  • July 26, 2022: [Writ]
  • July 21, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.