U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00076-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Combs
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 05, 2023: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 28, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 01, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 21, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.