U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00261-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ortiz
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 10, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 09, 2023: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 27, 2022: [Continue]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • July 29, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • July 29, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • July 29, 2022: [Discovery]
  • July 28, 2022: [Detention]
  • July 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 27, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 22, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.