U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00190-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Swain
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 13, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 13, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • July 29, 2022: [Discovery]
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • July 29, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • July 29, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • July 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.