U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00260-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Garcia
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 03, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 14, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 03, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • August 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 03, 2022: [Detention]
  • August 02, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
July, 2022
  • July 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 28, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • July 28, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.