U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:21-cr-00457-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Buba
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Order and Report on Person Under Supervision]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 13, 2023: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 06, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 06, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 10, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • August 02, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • August 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 02, 2022: [Detention]
July, 2022
  • July 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • July 29, 2022: [Unseal Case]
  • July 29, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.