U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00267-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hubbard
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Re-Appoint Counsel]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • November 22, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • November 15, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • November 15, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 30, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 29, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention by District Judge]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • August 31, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • August 30, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad testificandum]
  • August 29, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • August 29, 2022: [Review of Detention by District Judge]
  • August 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 05, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • August 04, 2022: [Discovery]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 04, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Pretrial Order Deadlines]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 04, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [Detention]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 01, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.