U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00082-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Rodrigo Felix
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • January 09, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 09, 2022: [Petition and Order]
August, 2022
  • August 01, 2022: [Order to Unseal Indictment]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • August 01, 2022: [Unseal Document]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 01, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • August 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 01, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Required]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.