U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00266-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Sola
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 16, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 15, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 01, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 01, 2022: [Detention]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.