U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00067-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hanson
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 10, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 10, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 08, 2023: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 13, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
August, 2022
  • August 25, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 25, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • August 17, 2022: [Review of Detention]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 02, 2022: [Discovery]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 02, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • August 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 02, 2022: [Detention]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 01, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.