U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00060-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Shawn Ray Davis
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Dismiss]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Vacate]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Suppress]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order to Unseal Indictment]
  • August 01, 2022: [Unseal Document]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • August 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order Vacating Hearing or Trial]
  • August 01, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.