U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00226-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Humphreys
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Continue]
December, 2022
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Furlough]
  • December 02, 2022: [Furlough]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Review of Detention]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Review of Detention]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order Setting Motion Hearing]
  • October 06, 2022: [Review of Detention]
  • October 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 03, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 04, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 02, 2022: [Discovery]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 02, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • August 02, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 02, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 02, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.