U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00277-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Perez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 11, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 11, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 11, 2023: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 08, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • August 09, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • August 09, 2022: [Discovery]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 09, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 09, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 09, 2022: [Detention]
  • August 04, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 04, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.