U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00275-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hayes
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 13, 2022: [Release Order]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • September 27, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • September 27, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • September 23, 2022: [Continue]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • September 16, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.