U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-cr-00109-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Trujillo
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 22, 2025: [Order Terminating Probation/Supervised Release]
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 20, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 19, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Detention]
  • September 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order Referring Motion]
  • August 23, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • August 16, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • August 16, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 15, 2022: [Detention]
  • August 03, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.