U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00278-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Drummond
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 22, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 22, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 13, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 13, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 23, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 08, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.