U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00283-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Reyes-Pantoja
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Order]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 17, 2023: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • November 29, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 18, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 18, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 05, 2022: [1 - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw as Counsel]
  • August 11, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • August 11, 2022: [Withdraw as Counsel]
  • August 11, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.