U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00279-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ercanbrack
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 17, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 17, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 17, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 13, 2023: [Exclude]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 17, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 17, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 15, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 15, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • August 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 12, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.