U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00269-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Anton
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • December 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 27, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 14, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 13, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • August 22, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • August 17, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 17, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • August 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 16, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 16, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.