U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00296-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Unasa
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 11, 2023: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 21, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 20, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 23, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • August 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 18, 2022: [Detention]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 18, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.