U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00087-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Kay
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 23, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • January 20, 2023: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 18, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 30, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 23, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • August 19, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • August 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 18, 2022: [Detention]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.