U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00089-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Ledesma-Sevilla
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 20, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 20, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 18, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • August 23, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 23, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Required]
  • August 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 18, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.