U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00080-2
  • Case Name: USA v. Nolton et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • November 15, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • August 26, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 26, 2022: [Discovery]
  • August 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 19, 2022: [Detention]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.