U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 4:22-cr-00093-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gonzalez-Ramirez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2022
  • September 14, 2022: [Order]
  • September 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • September 08, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • August 22, 2022: [~Util - Interpreter Required]
  • August 22, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 18, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.