U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00297-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Gill et al
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 25, 2025: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 19, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 18, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion to Associate/Consolidate Cases]
  • October 17, 2022: [Associate/Consolidate Cases]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order]
September, 2022
  • September 05, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • September 05, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • September 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 05, 2022: [Discovery]
  • September 05, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 05, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • August 23, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • August 19, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.