U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:22-cr-00084-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Adams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 12, 2025: [Amended Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Petition and Order]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 28, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 28, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 27, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 26, 2022: [Continue]
September, 2022
  • September 05, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • September 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • September 05, 2022: [Discovery]
  • September 05, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
August, 2022
  • August 31, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 22, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.