U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00254-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Hernandez-Rodriguez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • January 24, 2023: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 24, 2023: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • January 23, 2023: [Continue]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 01, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • November 01, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Continue]
  • October 21, 2022: [Order]
  • October 14, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2022
  • August 29, 2022: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • August 23, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Appointing CJA Counsel]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • August 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 23, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.