U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00310-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Soperanez
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 04, 2022: [Order Referring B3 and Consent to Entry of Plea]
August, 2022
  • August 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
  • August 26, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • August 26, 2022: [Discovery]
  • August 26, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Fast Track Deadlines]
  • August 26, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
  • August 23, 2022: [Detention]
  • August 23, 2022: [Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.