U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00273-1
  • Case Name: USA v. OBrien
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Order Withdrawing Warrant]
September, 2022
  • September 15, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • September 15, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order Setting Hearing or Trial]
August, 2022
  • August 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Reassign Case]
  • August 23, 2022: [Reassign Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.