U.S. Criminal Court Records for the District of Utah

utah Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Criminal Court for the District of Utah
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cr-00193-1
  • Case Name: USA v. Williams
  • Filing Type: Criminal
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • December 23, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • December 23, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • December 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 22, 2022: [Continue]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order to Continue - Ends of Justice]
  • October 12, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • October 12, 2022: [~Util - Terminate Motions]
  • October 11, 2022: [Continue]
August, 2022
  • August 23, 2022: [Order of Temporary Detention]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Discovery]
  • August 23, 2022: [Discovery]
  • August 23, 2022: [Brady Order]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order Appointing Public Defender]
  • August 23, 2022: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • August 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • August 23, 2022: [Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.